Accounts and annual returns THE MAYNARD TRUST

Charity number: 1132432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 April 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 March 2022 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2022 412 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 March 2022 778 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required