Financial history THE POINTER FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1131857
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £56.46k £179.16k £94.40k £279.30k £180.78k
Total expenditure £56.10k £176.57k £98.88k £297.56k £182.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A