Trustees Oxygen House Foundation
Charity number: 1131659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Lees | Chair | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anne Fowler | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mayor | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Mike West | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Pawley | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Anderson | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Pym | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Duckworth | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Digory Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ed Kirby | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sam Esgate | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Littler | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beth Barrie | Trustee | 20 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Atkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Howard | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steven Thorner | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Clark | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
William Benfold | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gingell | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|||||
David Bromley | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon Witts | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Buckley | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Manton | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Kingston | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jones | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Emma McClelland | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Irons | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Cobb | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kate Williamson | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Simon Doherty | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tim Paulden | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anton Altmann | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ralph Olsson | Trustee | 09 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Dixon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Elizabeth Dixon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BARCLAY WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Timothy John Landy | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.