HOUSE OF HODGE

Charity number: 1135243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £10.98k £15.02k £18.28k £19.02k £25.46k
Total expenditure £9.95k £17.12k £14.52k £11.54k £22.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k