HAUSER BEARS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The object of the company is to further such purposes as are charitable for the advancement of the welfare and the preservation of all species of bear throughout the world and prevention of such cruelty to such bears in each case for the public benefit.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Anifeiliaid
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Swydd Warwig
- Byrma
- Cambodia
- Canada
- Gwlad Thai
- India
- Indonesia
- Laos
- Malaysia
- Rwmania
Llywodraethu
- 16 Hydref 2020: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1152792 LOVE UNDERDOGS
- 07 Tachwedd 2009: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Hydref 2020: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £76.42k | £277.57k | £97.94k | £2.78k | £1.61k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £77.64k | £243.45k | £125.25k | £10.43k | £3.49k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | 28 Mai 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2018 | 02 Gorffennaf 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2017 | 06 Awst 2018 | 7 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2017 | 06 Awst 2018 | 7 diwrnod yn hwyr |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 OCTOBER 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE WELFARE AND THE PRESERVATION OF ALL SPECIES OF BEAR THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO SUCH BEARS (IN EACH CASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT) INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (1) FUNDING THE REHABILITATION AND RESCUE OF BEARS IN NEED OF CARE BY REASON OF MALTREATMENT, PARTICULARLY OF THOSE BEARS USED IN FARMING OR FOR ENTERTAINMENT (2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE ITS UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF BEARS GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THEIR NATURAL HABITATS, AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF INDIVIDUAL SPECIES OF BEARS; (3) ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING THOSE CURRENTLY INVOLVED IN THE EXPLOITATION OR MALTREATMENT OF BEARS TO PURSUE ALTERNATIVE ACTIVITIES; (4) UNDERTAKING, FUNDING AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH; AND (B) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY MAY IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE."'
Maes buddion
THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window