Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1132208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

302 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nancy Acquaah Trustee 26 June 2021
Lambeth Walk Methodist Church
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
LAMBETH CIRCUIT METHODIST CHURCH
Overdue by 88 days
Rev Mark Dunn-Wilson Trustee 26 June 2021
THE COCKIN CHARITY
Received: On time
TRURO METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly Methodist District
Received: On time
Mid Cornwall Circuit, The Methodist Church
Received: On time
TRURO STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
TRANSFORMATION CORNWALL
Received: On time
Revd Stuart Earl Trustee 26 June 2021
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NORTH WEST DURHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Revd John Ritson Trustee 26 June 2021
THE ANGLICAN AND METHODIST CHURCH OF ST. ANDREW, PADDOCK WOOD
Received: On time
Revd Joanna Rand Trustee 26 June 2021
SOUTH LAKES CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JONATHAN BUCKLEY Trustee 26 June 2021
PXI PARSON CROSS INITIATIVE (PROJECTS)
Received: On time
CHURCHES FOR YOUTH IN SHEFFIELD 17
Received: On time
ALISTER MCCLURE Trustee 26 June 2021
YORKSHIRE NORTH AND EAST DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Revd Ruth Fry Trustee 26 June 2021
Winchester Eastleigh and Romsey Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Revd Geoffrey Farrar Trustee 26 June 2021
PUTNEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SOUTHLANDS METHODIST TRUST
Received: 40 days late
Revd Sydney Samuel Lake Trustee 26 June 2021
WEY VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH: SOUTH-EAST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Revd Benjamin Scrivens Trustee 26 June 2021
THE METHODIST CHURCH - BARNSLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
The Methodist Church Barnsley North West
Received: On time
George Kulasingham Trustee 26 June 2021
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Deacon Selina Nisbett Trustee 26 June 2021
ALL SAINTS METHODIST CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Rev Catherine Bird Trustee 26 June 2021
UNITED STOCKPORT CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TRANSFORMING CHURCHES AND COMMUNITIES
Received: On time
Revd Neil Vickers Trustee 26 June 2021
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE FLOTTERGATE HOMES GRIMSBY
Received: On time
Karen Attaway Trustee 26 June 2021
ARIES UK
Received: 116 days late
EILEEN CLARKSON Trustee 26 June 2021
TADCASTER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Kathleen Brydon Trustee 26 June 2021
MID DERBYSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 74 days late
Revd Paul Smith Trustee 26 June 2021
CLIFF COLLEGE
Received: On time
Revd Robert Roberts Trustee 26 June 2021
SIR ALFRED JERMYN AND OTHERS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
BENJAMIN SMITH
Received: On time
METHODIST CHARITIES FOR YOUTH WORK
Received: On time
WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Ruth Parrott Trustee 26 June 2021
METHODIST WOMEN IN BRITAIN
Received: On time
Rev Rory Dalgliesh Trustee 26 June 2021
HAXBY CHRISTIAN CAFE LTD
Received: On time
Deacon Lemia Nkwelah Trustee 26 June 2021
NORTH NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Ruth Dawson Trustee 26 June 2021
CITY OF MANCHESTER AQUATICS SWIM TEAM
Received: On time
SALFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Deacon Gail Morgan Trustee 26 June 2021
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Elizabeth Hudson Trustee 26 June 2021
GRIMSBY AND CLEETHORPES METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE FLOTTERGATE HOMES GRIMSBY
Received: On time
Niall Michael Briggs Trustee 26 June 2021
BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Craig Price Trustee 26 June 2021
D&S PRODUCTIONS
Received: On time
Rev Zena Smith Trustee 26 June 2021
METHODIST CHURCH SOUTHEND AND LEIGH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Jennifer Parnell Trustee 26 June 2021
REDHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Barbara Easton Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Margaret Bowerman Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Dr Elizabeth Burroughs Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Carol Reeves Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Bishop Sudarshana Devadhar Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Paul Dunston Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
David Watson Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Ermine Mitchell Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Sahr Yambasu Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Jenny Cornell Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Dr Ruth Midcalf Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Dr Ian Morris Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Nicola Martyn-Beck Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Katie Strange Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Margaret Greer Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Anna Mayers Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Christopher Clark Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rev Karen Beecham Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Paul Donnison Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Ruth Mathews Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Naomi Prince Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Roxanne Bromley Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Beti Holmes Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Isaac Moore Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Timothy Simms Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd James Eaton-Challinor Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Gill Daly Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Elaine Lindridge Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rev Paul Carter Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd David Hardman Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Greg Obong-Oshotse Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Dr Bart Woodhouse Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Richard Sheard Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Trish Earlam Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Kerry Tankard Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Michael Pryke Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Leonie O'Donoghue Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
John Spencer Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Hannah Rednall Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Rosemary Fletcher Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Janis Simons Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd George Mawire Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Dr David Field Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Deacon Annette Sharp Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Susan Levitt Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Dr Heather Morris Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rev Nicola Briggs Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Jackie Whitehouse Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rev Melinda Bell Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Phoebe Parkin Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Peryline Takavarasha Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Margaret Stones Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Naomi Kaiga Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Laura Tunnacliffe Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Eleanor smith Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Ian Smart Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Deacon Ruth Yorke Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Jane Wild Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rachel Barwise Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Pamela Gidney Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Zariel Konadu Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rocky Chi Lok Chan Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Bernard Melling Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Hazel Loney Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Maggie Finbow Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Paul Mellor Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Daud Irfan Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Feddy Takavarasha Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Matthew Hays Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Joshua Orme Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Ian Athey Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Gabriel Dedji Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Dudley Coates Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Emma Crippen Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Ben Twumasi Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd P J Jackson Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Brian Tucknott Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Janice Rusling Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Rev Nicholas Baker Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Novette Headley Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Jack Hodge Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Revd Dr Eleanor Jackson Trustee 26 June 2021
None on record
Joanne Mary Anderton BA Hons Trustee 30 June 2020
ST NEOTS AND HUNTINGDON METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev John Raymond Izzard Trustee 27 June 2020
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH ISLE OF WIGHT CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Andrew Coombe Moffoot Trustee 27 June 2020
LYMM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Lynn Petersen Trustee 27 June 2020
THE KING'S CROSS CHURCH AND JUNCTION, HEXTHORPE, DONCASTER
Recently registered
THE KING'S CROSS CHURCH, HEXTHORPE
Received: On time
Julie Ann Close-Mitchell Trustee 27 June 2020
THE LEADERS OF WORSHIP AND PREACHERS HOMES
Received: On time
MID LINCOLNSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Overdue by 88 days
Rev Dawn Julia Saunders Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Ann Patricia Leck Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Kira Louise Davies Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Madalena Leao Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev Dr Trevor Hoggard Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Wendy Joy Barwise Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev David John Speirs Trustee 27 June 2020
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CHURCH
Recently registered
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Dr Karl Aidan Rutlidge Trustee 27 June 2020
KINGSTON LGBT FORUM
Received: On time
KINGSTON COMMUNITY REFUGEE SPONSORSHIP
Received: On time
Rev Ashley Robert Cooper Trustee 27 June 2020
STAFFORDSHIRE MOORLANDS METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev John David Howard Trustee 27 June 2020
ELM RIDGE METHODIST CHURCH DARLINGTON
Received: On time
METHODISTS FOR WORLD MISSION
Received: On time
Darlington and Teesdale Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Rev Jacqueline Bellfield Trustee 27 June 2020
THE CYRIL EDWARD GOURLEY VICTORIA CROSS ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
ST LUKES METHODIST CHURCH HOYLAKE
Received: On time
Norma Claire Evans Trustee 27 June 2020
WOLVERHAMPTON AND SHREWSBURY METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Rev RICHARD JOHN BYASS Trustee 27 June 2020
SHERWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ARNOLD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Richard Ormrod Trustee 27 June 2020
BURNLEY AND PENDLE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE LANCASHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Andrew Lowe Trustee 27 June 2020
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S METHODIST CHURCH WHITLEY BAY
Received: On time
NORTH SHIELDS & WHITLEY BAY METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Stephanie Njeru Trustee 27 June 2020
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Sonia Marcia Hicks Trustee 27 June 2020
WEMBLEY CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WEMBLEY PARK LANE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Emma Caroline Holroyd Trustee 27 June 2020
NORTH LANCASHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Deacon Ian Henry Murray Trustee 27 June 2020
COTTENHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
CAMBRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
WESLEY METHODIST CHURCH, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Rev Beverly Hollings Trustee 27 June 2020
THE CASTLE EDEN METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Steven Robert McKay Cooper Trustee 27 June 2020
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
ISLINGTON FAITHS FORUM
Received: On time
JANET ARTHUR Trustee 27 June 2020
WESLEY HOUSE, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
LONDON MISSION (NORTH-WEST) METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Paul Anthony Yarrien Trustee 27 June 2020
Winchester Eastleigh and Romsey Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Rev Dr James Neal Tebbutt Trustee 27 June 2020
THE METHODIST CHURCH CUMBRIA DISTRICT (NO.9)
Received: On time
Rev Francis M'Itiiri Trustee 27 June 2020
NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 12 days late
Rev Etleva Walker Trustee 27 June 2020
NORTH SHIELDS & WHITLEY BAY METHODIST CHURCH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Samuel Eric McBratney Trustee 27 June 2020
DIGNITY AND WORTH
Received: On time
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MARY GIBBS Trustee 27 June 2020
THE FENS CIRCUIT
Received: On time
DEBORAH SUSAN STOREY Trustee 27 June 2020
AIRE AND CALDER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Daniel Mark Keen Trustee 27 June 2020
CHESHIRE SOUTH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Overdue by 453 days
Rev Anna Louise Flindell Trustee 27 June 2020
PLAYDAYS PRE-SCHOOL MEETING IN THE METHODIST CHURCH HALL
Received: On time
SHEILA MALLINSON Trustee 27 June 2020
PENRITH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ALLISON GUEST Trustee 27 June 2020
GOOLE AND SELBY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Margaret Anne Haggarty Trustee 27 June 2020
THAMES VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Mabel Rudo Nyazika Trustee 27 June 2020
SALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Overdue by 453 days
Paul James Strange Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Caroline Ruth Salmon Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev David Jebb Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Deacon Ramona Samuel Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Sandra Haywood Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev Jennifer Rani Pathmarajah Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Lynne LING Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Sarah Murray Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Deacon Laura Evans Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Deacon Jennifer Alison Jane Jones Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Alan James Window Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Deacon Alison McMillan Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev Kerry Wayne Tankard Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev Dr Keith Richard Albans Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Hilary Joy Balsdon Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Steven William Thomas Rogers Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Katharine Elizabeth Crew Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Deacon Tracey Jane Hume Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Carolyn Jayne Lawrence Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Rev Dr Christine Margaret Dutton Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Christopher Joel Clark Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
Barbara Joan Harrison Trustee 27 June 2020
None on record
James David Blackhall Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
DEACON Denise Ann Creed Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Rev Dr Patrick Kofi Amissah Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Rev Helen D Cameron Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Eleanor Jane Allin Trustee 01 July 2019
THE NEW ROOM/JOHN WESLEY'S CHAPEL
Received: On time
MUSGROVE LEUKAEMIC GROUP SOMERSET
Received: On time
TAUNTON DEANE AND SOUTH SEDGEMOOR METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Chadwick Trustee 01 July 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH - CLEVELAND AND DANBY CIRCUIT
Received: 18 days late
Rev Rachel Ann Bending Trustee 01 July 2019
EALING TRINITY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
James Tristan Carver Trustee 01 July 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH NOTTINGHAM SOUTH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
John Derek Beaumont Trustee 01 July 2019
THE RETREAT COTTAGES
Received: On time
Andrew Blythe Beattle Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Hannah Eve Bevan Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Georgina Graham Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Allan Henderson Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Woodall Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Rev IAN HOWARTH Trustee 29 June 2019
BIRMINGHAM INTERNATIONAL STUDENT HOMES
Received: On time
ADAVU
Recently registered
KATHRYN'S MERCY HOME TRUST (UK)
Received: On time
Verity Wild Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Samuel John Lindridge Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Deacon Angela Shereni Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Omobolaji Nzekwe Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Rev Katherine Anne Leonowicz Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Richard Alan Wills Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Rev Glayne Worgan Trustee 29 June 2019
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: 21 days late
SALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Overdue by 453 days
IRENE MCKAY Trustee 29 June 2019
HIGHWAY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
KENDAL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev BARRY OWEN Trustee 29 June 2019
TRINITY MISSION CASTLEFORD CIO
Received: On time
AIRE AND CALDER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev RACHAEL LOUISE HAWKINS Trustee 29 June 2019
SOUTHDOWN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
HARPENDEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ALL SAINTS' CHURCH, BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
WEST HERTFORDSHIRE AND BORDERS METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
ANGLICAN METHODIST ASSOCIATION (BERKHAMSTED) LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Farai Mapamula Trustee 29 June 2019
BIRMINGHAM METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Charity Nzegwu Trustee 29 June 2019
CAMBRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Stephen Paul Santry Trustee 29 June 2019
MINT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Revd Dr Roberta Ruth Topham Trustee 29 June 2019
CHRISTCHURCH ILKLEY
Received: On time
Rev Dr Simon Christopher Edwards Trustee 29 June 2019
BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Linda Mary Davies Trustee 29 June 2019
METHODIST CHURCH IN WALES - WALES SYNOD CYMRU
Received: On time
Rev HELEN RUTH HOLLANDS Trustee 29 June 2019
SOUTH KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Helen Ruth Kirk Trustee 29 June 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH - CHESTER AND STOKE-ON-TRENT DISTRICT
Overdue by 88 days
THE QUEEN'S FOUNDATION FOR ECUMENICAL THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CHESHIRE
Received: On time
ANYA GOLDSACK Trustee 29 June 2019
SOUTH KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Revd Canon Julian Mark Pursehouse Trustee 29 June 2019
EAST ANGLIA DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE LEYS AND ST FAITH'S SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GRAHAM KAY Trustee 29 June 2019
THE METHODIST CHURCH, POULTON LE FYLDE
Received: On time
THE LANCASHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH, NORTH FYLDE CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Aileen Fox Trustee 29 June 2019
CENTRAL NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
John Robert Hogarth Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Dr Richard Vautrey Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Samuel David Ebden Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Dr Daleep Mukarji Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Charlotte Hambly Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Margaret Laura Rees Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Prof Clive Marsh Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Valerie Ann Mayers Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Grace McAloon Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Rev Bryan Andrew Yardy Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Rev Steven Mark Slaney Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
John Richard Walsh Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Steven Goldsack Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
Rev Andrew Peter de Ville Trustee 02 August 2018
MEON VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Gillian Margaret Dascombe Trustee 02 July 2018
FARNWORTH AND WORSLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Richard Mark Andrew Trustee 02 July 2018
DARLINGTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Rev Paul Davis Trustee 02 July 2018
TRUSTEES FOR METHODIST CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
LAURA CLEMENTINA WHITEHEAD
Received: On time
M C A CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev DELYTH ANGHARAD LIDDELL Trustee 02 July 2018
DIGNITY AND WORTH
Received: On time
THE GATHERING - CARDIFF
Received: On time
Rev Mark Rowland Trustee 02 July 2018
DIGNITY AND WORTH
Received: On time
ONEBODYONEFAITH LTD.
Received: On time
Ruby Beech Trustee 02 July 2018
Methodist Conference Property at Central Hall Westminster
Received: On time
NEWARK AND SOUTHWELL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Ian Stuart Rutherford Trustee 02 July 2018
MANCHESTER CITY CENTRE STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Methodist Central Hall, Manchester
Received: 5 days late
Rev NAOMI COOKE Trustee 02 July 2018
BETHESDA METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Susan Jane Eldridge Trustee 02 July 2018
NORWICH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Jacqueline Rose Watson Trustee 02 July 2018
TORRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
CAROLYN HOTHERSALL Trustee 02 July 2018
CHORLEY AND LEYLAND METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
THE LANCASHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Rev SIMON JOHN CLARKE Trustee 02 July 2018
Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly Methodist District
Received: On time
Mid Cornwall Circuit, The Methodist Church
Received: On time
Rev Christine Audrey Hawke Trustee 02 July 2018
COTTINGLEY COMMUNITY PROJECT
Overdue by 88 days
NORTH KIRKLEES AND MORLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 77 days late
Rev Christopher John Collins Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Sheridan Pengelly Trustee 02 July 2018
THE METHODIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Heather Valerie Lovelady Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Deacon Joy Michaela Everingham Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Pamela Joy Lavender Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Revd Dr Jonathan Richard Hustler Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Rev Bonni-Belle Fisackerly Pickard Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
REVEREND DR BARBARA CAROLYN GLASSON Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
Pedzisai Grace Katsande Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
DEACON KAREN MCBRIDE Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
Rev Jongikaya Zihle Dr Trustee 26 June 2017
WESLEY'S CHAPEL AND LEYSIAN MISSION
Received: On time
SUTTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
LONDON CHURCH LEADERS
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ESSEX AND EAST LONDON
Received: On time
Y CARE INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
WEST LONDON MISSION METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev LESLIE MICHAEL NEWTON Trustee 26 June 2017
FRESH EXPRESSIONS LIMITED
YORKSHIRE NORTH AND EAST DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
David Henry James Trustee 26 June 2017
TRUSTEES FOR METHODIST CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
LAURA CLEMENTINA WHITEHEAD
Received: On time
M C A CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BRAMHALL AND WYTHENSHAWE CIRCUIT
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH - MANCHESTER & STOCKPORT DISTRICT
Received: On time
CHEADLE HULME METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Balachandren Muthuvaloe Gnanapragasam Trustee 26 June 2017
DALIT SOLIDARITY NETWORK UK
Received: On time
Rev David Michael Chapman Trustee 26 June 2017
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN HERTFORDSHIRE
Received: On time
BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SHARED CHURCHES (HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
DEACON JONATHAN MILLER Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
Dorothy Grace North Trustee 26 June 2017
VICTORIA METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev R Margaret K Mwailu Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
Keith Norman Trustee 26 June 2017
BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BAR-N-BUS TRUST
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH SOUTHEND AND LEIGH CIRCUIT
Received: On time
RAYLEIGH CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES TRUST
Received: On time
REV STEPHEN JAMES POXON Trustee 26 June 2017
ST. MARK'S METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Sandra Anne Coates Trustee 26 June 2017
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Mrs Sue Smith Trustee 26 June 2017
DURHAM AND DEERNESS VALLEY CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SHELAGH MORGAN MCIH Trustee 01 September 2015
WEST SUSSEX (COAST AND DOWNS) METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Tim Swindell Trustee 01 September 2015
ENFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: 18 days late
Ian Christopher White Trustee 01 September 2015
THE METHODIST CHURCH - CHESTER AND STOKE-ON-TRENT DISTRICT
Overdue by 88 days
Rev NIGEL Timothy COWGILL Trustee 01 September 2015
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ROMFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev DARREN GARFIELD Trustee 01 September 2015
FARNWORTH AND WORSLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
BOLTON METHODIST MISSION
Overdue by 88 days
Mrs E Jill Baker Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev PHILIP JAMES JACKSON Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev CATHERINE EMMA DIXON Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Rev Ann Louise Lett Trustee 01 September 2015
BOSTON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Matthew Charles Collins Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
ANTHONY BOATENG Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
DENISE SUSAN TOMLINSON Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Rev STEPHEN JOHN LINDRIDGE Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
ANNA MARGARET MALNUTT Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Browse Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Rev Dr Jonathan Howard Pye Trustee 01 September 2014
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOMERSET
Received: On time
METHODIST INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
BRISTOL DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE LEONARD LAITY STOATE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE NEW ROOM/JOHN WESLEY'S CHAPEL
Received: On time
Katrin Anne Hackett Trustee 01 September 2014
BANNER CROSS METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE ECUMENICAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST ANDREW'S PSALTER LANE CHURCH, SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
NETHER GREEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Revd Dr Andrew John Lunn Trustee 01 September 2014
BOLTON AND ROCHDALE METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: 21 days late
METHODIST CHURCH - MANCHESTER & STOCKPORT DISTRICT
Received: On time
ST PETER'S HOUSE CHAPLAINCY
Received: 56 days late
REV DR NICOLA VERNIER PRICE-TEBBUTT Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
CHRISTINE ARMSTRONG Trustee 01 September 2014
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SHERYL MILANDA ANDERSON Trustee 01 September 2014
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN THE MERSEYSIDE REGION
Received: On time
THE LIVERPOOL AND DISTRICT FREE CHURCH FEDERAL COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE COMMUNITY FOR SPIRITUAL FORMATION
Received: On time
REV GILL NEWTON Trustee 01 September 2014
SHEFFIELD METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Rev FAITH MWARI NYOTA MA Trustee 01 September 2014
LONDON DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Dr Jennifer Anne Hurd Trustee 06 July 2013
CYNGOR YSGOLION SUL AC ADDYSG GRISTNOGOL CYMRU
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN WALES - WALES SYNOD CYMRU
Received: On time
MR DOUG SWANNEY Trustee 06 July 2013
None on record
REV JENNY DYER Trustee 01 May 2013
None on record
Rev ROSEMARIE ELAINE GAYE CLARKE Trustee 01 May 2013
None on record
Rev RICHARD HALL Trustee 12 October 2011
None on record
Rev LORAINE NANCY MELLOR Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record
Rev ANDREW JAMES LESTER HOLLINS Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record
Rev BRUCE DAVID THOMPSON Trustee 06 October 2011
None on record
Rev Paul Martin Trustee 06 October 2011
METHODIST MINISTERS' HOUSING SOCIETY
Received: On time
JOSHUA BARBER'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CAROLINE MARY STEAD Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH YORKSHIRE WEST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Rev RUTH GEE Trustee
METHODIST HOMES
Received: On time
Rev David Hinchliffe Trustee
THE METHODIST CHURCH: SOUTH-EAST DISTRICT
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SURREY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH HELEN OVEY Trustee
WESLEY COLLEGE, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
WESLEY HOUSE, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Rev Dr Stephen David Wigley Trustee
METHODIST CHURCH IN WALES - WALES SYNOD CYMRU
Received: On time
SIR DAVID R LLEWELLYN FOR A RESIDENCE OR HOME FOR CLERGYMEN AND MINISTERS OF THE GOSPEL
Received: On time
MR STEVE COOPER Trustee
LIVERPOOL DISTRICT METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WIRRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Graham Thompson Trustee
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOMERSET
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION FOR PASTORAL SUPERVISION AND EDUCATION
Received: On time
THE NORFOLK BROADS CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev RICHARD JEREMY TEAL Trustee
DRIFFIELD-HORNSEA METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
HORACE TAYLOR TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Michaela Anne Youngson Trustee
None on record
MARTIN JOHN HARKER Trustee
None on record