AL HUDA WELFARE FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1137776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £397.01k £242.59k £273.04k £272.49k £345.12k
Total expenditure £151.89k £149.95k £144.02k £282.99k £336.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A