GLOSSOP FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to other registered charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GEORGE GLOSSOP | Chair |
|
||||||
MRS L M ATHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS C J APPLEYARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS G LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS GEORGE GLOSSOP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sarah June Glossop | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.87k | £11.17k | £13.05k | £15.23k | £15.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.44k | £17.52k | £16.34k | £16.85k | £10.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING PUBLIC BENEFIT OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO SUPPORT BY WAY OF MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS SUCH OTHER UK CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 East Street
Coggeshall
COLCHESTER
Essex
CO6 1SH
- Phone:
- 01376561621
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window