MOSAME PROJECTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1132546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.49k £10.93k £9.94k £13.06k £2.30k
Total expenditure £9.77k £12.37k £10.74k £8.79k £8.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A