HILLINGDON STREET ANGELS

Charity number: 1140000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.71k £4.57k £1.46k £1.04k £2.36k
Total expenditure £2.69k £2.76k £2.36k £3.57k £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A