THE GREAT NORTH ART SHOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are the encouragement and advancement of, and the education of children and adults in, the visual arts in Ripon and the surrounding area. The charity's main activity is the holding of an annual exhibition in Ripon Cathedral displaying art by both established and up and coming artists, mostly from the North of England but also from further afield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY LOUISE ORME | Chair |
|
||||||
JULIET DIANA JOWITT | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Michael Henry | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.06k | £0 | £0 | £29.89k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.20k | £4.09k | £2.65k | £34.33k | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF, AND THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN, THE VISUAL ARTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PAINTING, SKETCHING AND SCULPTURE) IN RIPON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
RIPON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE HOUSE
MARKINGTON
HARROGATE
HG3 3PQ
- Phone:
- 01765677256
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window