Financial history SYNCHRONICITY EARTH

Charity number: 1132786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.66m £1.60m £3.10m £3.33m £4.28m
Total expenditure £1.44m £1.50m £1.95m £2.97m £3.30m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.06m £1.56m £3.10m £3.32m £4.28m
Income - Other trading activities £251.78k £10.99k £2.00k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £650.77k £108.30k £417.00k £0 £253.00k
Income - Investment £162 £422 £4.00k £4.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £26.79k £3.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.20m £1.43m £1.87m £2.84m £3.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £243.38k £73.37k £86.00k £125.00k £125.00k
Expenditure - Governance £2.96k £35.35k £17.00k £29.00k £20.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £518.64k £846.25k £1.16m £2.14m £242.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0