BETHESDA MINISTRIES UK

Charity number: 1133658
Charity reporting is overdue by 1056 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 325 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 325 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 690 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 690 days
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1056 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1056 days
Annual return 29 April 2017 26 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 April 2017 26 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 02 March 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 02 March 2017 2 days late Download