BETHESDA MINISTRIES UK

Charity number: 1133658
Charity reporting is overdue by 1065 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 29/04/2017
Total gross income £332.14k £250.97k £186.77k £174.18k £73.30k
Total expenditure £316.19k £260.17k £182.84k £164.30k £146.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0