1 2 3 SOLEIL

Charity number: 1132936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 19 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 June 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 June 2019 26 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 02 July 2017 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 July 2017 32 days late Download