1 2 3 SOLEIL

Charity number: 1132936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £117.55k £126.93k £122.80k £140.16k £111.39k
Total expenditure £110.12k £132.23k £131.88k £112.41k £125.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A