Trustees THE ANTEROS ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1135692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jezrom Bokcaerin Self-Fordham Trustee 15 April 2025
None on record
Karen Watling Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Anita Rickard Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Michael Spender Trustee 18 December 2024
None on record
Sue Bergin Trustee 30 October 2024
None on record
Niul Dillon Hatcher Trustee 03 September 2024
SMALL CHURCH CHARITIES
Received: On time
SIR PETER SEAMAN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
GREAT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Martin George Kurrein Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Benjamin Salter Trustee 15 August 2019
None on record