SAVE THE ORANGUTAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the Orangutan
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Indonesia
- Malaysia
Governance
- 09 December 2009: Standard registration
- BORNEO ORANGUTAN SURVIVAL FOUNDATION (GLOBAL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hanne Guertler | Chair | 04 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joel Cian Evans | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henrik Bonne | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.39k | £23.99k | £100.10k | £21.39k | £21.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.22k | £26.80k | £48.91k | £39.65k | £27.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT PROJECTS CONCERNING THE CONSERVATION AND SURVIVAL OF THE WORLD ORANG-UTAN POPULATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THEIR HABITAT AND THE FLORA AND FAUNA WITHIN SUCH HABITAT, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION OF THE FOREGOING): 3.1 TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE PROJECTS CONDUCTED BY BORNEO ORANG-UTAN SURVIVAL FOUNDATION IN INDONESIA ("BOSF") CONCERNING THE SURVIVAL AND CONSERVATION OF THE WORLD ORANG-UTAN POPULATION; 3.2 TO PROMOTE, CO-ORDINATE AND SUPPORT OTHER INSTITUTIONS, ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIETIES, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE AND WHETHER OF A LOCAL OR INTERNATIONAL NATURE ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE CONSERVATION PROJECTS CONDUCTED BY BOSF INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) NATIONAL MEMBER ORGANISATIONS; 3.3 TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, CONCERNING THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ITS CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE SURVIVAL OF THE WORLD ORANG-UTAN POPULATION
Area of benefit
INDONESIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Save The Orangutan
C/O Smarties Bookkeeping Limited
The Keep
Creech Castle
Taunton
TA1 2DX
- Phone:
- +4533930650
- Email:
- info@savetheorangutan.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window