Accounts and annual returns WELLBEING FOR LIFE TRUST

Charity number: 1134906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 November 2019 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required