HILLSIDE PRE-SCHOOL (CHORLEYWOOD) LTD

Charity number: 1132378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre-School providing education for children under the statutory school age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £85,810
Total expenditure: £85,550

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kayleigh Louise Maxwell Chair 25 July 2022
None on record
Jessica Jennings Tredell Trustee 30 April 2025
None on record
Jacob Dyer Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Emma Dyer Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Nicholas Paul Moeke Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Verity Jane Smart Trustee 25 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £85.85k £72.61k £72.01k £59.65k £85.81k
Total expenditure £102.17k £68.25k £84.97k £77.17k £85.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.07k £30.87k £13.89k £500 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chorleywood Free Church
Hillside Road
Chorleywood
Hertfordshire
WD3 5AS
Phone:
01923 284878