FRIENDS OF FAIRFIELD SCHOOL (BATLEY)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Fund raising through various sponsored events for example: dragon boat race plus annual fund raising events such as the christmas fayre/raffle. Funded activities include pantomine, presents for the children, supplements to educational visits and additional non statutory items for school.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 May 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Calderdale
- Dinas Leeds
- Kirklees
Llywodraethu
- 07 Gorffennaf 2010: Cofrestrwyd
- 28 Mawrth 2023: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- FRIENDS OF FAIRFIELD SCHOOL (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/05/2011 | 31/05/2012 | 31/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £5.91k | £8.20k | £7.13k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.21k | £13.81k | £4.61k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT FAIRFIELD SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES THAT ARE NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE. 3. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
FAIRFIELD SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window