Financial history THE MARCHUS TRUST

Charity number: 1137768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £277.13k £856.99k £1.89m £1.91m £554.13k
Total expenditure £53.37k £79.69k £98.74k £254.18k £255.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £810.28k £1.81m £1.80m £455.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £46.71k £79.01k £109.53k £99.13k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £44.65k £68.50k £212.64k £208.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £30.06k £30.24k £41.54k £47.14k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £4.80k £7.50k £6.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £44.65k £41.40k £139.90k £149.04k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £30.06k £30.24k £41.54k £47.14k
Expenditure - Other N/A £4.98k £0 £0 £0