PROVIDENCE SUPPORTING PEOPLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providence Supporting People was formed in response to cuts which directly affected those suffering from alcohol and drug dependency and other addictive disorders. It has become almost impossible for those most in need to access any form of quality drug rehab or alcohol rehab programme. Providence Supporting People aim to ensure that those who need help are able to get the help they deserve
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
Governance
- 18 February 2010: Standard registration
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/03/2016 | 26/03/2017 | 25/03/2018 | 24/03/2019 | 24/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.17k | £220.01k | £204.00k | £84.48k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.49k | £225.15k | £205.78k | £92.81k | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 March 2019 | 16 March 2020 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 March 2019 | 16 March 2020 | 52 days late | |
Annual return | 25 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | 5 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND AID IN THE PROCESS OF REHABILITATION FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM DRUG, ALCOHOL AND OTHER ADDICTIVE DISORDERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING CARE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, SUPPORTED ACCOMMODATION AND PROTECTING THE HEALTH OF THE INDIVIDUAL, THEIR FAMILY AND THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window