HATCH WARREN UNDER FIVES PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Early Years Childcare Provider in Basingstoke
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £267,829 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellie Sole | Chair | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Orsborn | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Shiell | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Faye Fenton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tamsyn Steenkamp | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Loughrey | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jack Winterbottom | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Buckingham | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Luckett | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.23k | £231.75k | £214.50k | £264.29k | £301.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.91k | £225.80k | £215.60k | £262.85k | £286.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £6.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £251.14k | £181.72k | £172.58k | £208.23k | £267.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HATCHWARREN COMMUNITY CENTRE
LONG CROSS LANE
HATCH WARREN
BASINGSTOKE
RG22 4XF
- Phone:
- 01256322788
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window