Financial history A.C.E

Charity number: 1133594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.74k £25.84k £31.14k £52.71k £62.01k
Total expenditure £12.72k £21.36k £16.47k £50.08k £54.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A