Financial history KILBURN OLDER VOICES EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1137417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £26.14k £26.46k £33.74k £26.12k £30.66k
Total expenditure £25.88k £29.14k £24.95k £26.23k £25.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A