Trustees ALL PAKISTAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION UK
Charity number: 1136005
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Seemi Saeed Awan | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIRAN ALI | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Salma Ullah | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Samia Ali | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nausheen Ahmed | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Memona Baig | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.