Financial history BARN ELMS SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1135370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £278.88k £262.65k £293.88k £274.76k £381.76k
Total expenditure £232.11k £231.30k £209.05k £200.78k £232.78k
Income from government contracts £40.00k £30.00k £30.00k £30.00k £30.00k
Income from government grants £2.50k N/A N/A £5.02k N/A