Trustees YMCA THAMES GATEWAY
Charity number: 1133269

Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rodrigo Rodriguez-Fernandez | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Farrar | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Omosoji Otudeko | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Carol Furminger | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Samuels | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rita Naana Asamoah | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Georgina Strevens | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Saunders | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL BURDEN | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Scott-Malden | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.