Accounts and annual returns THE NEW LONDON SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1133578
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Overdue by 36 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 06 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 July 2021 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 01 July 2021 184 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 January 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 13 January 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window