Trustees THE NEW LONDON SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1133578
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abigail Levin Chair 07 September 2020
None on record
Andrew Hirsch Trustee 11 January 2021
None on record
Joseph Carlebach Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Judy Stone Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Aviva Raichelson Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Brian Linden Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Julian Dawes Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Jeremy Parlons Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Robert Low Trustee 26 July 2017
None on record