Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WEARDALE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1133650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 23 October 2019 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 14 December 2017 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required