HADDENHAM BEER FESTIVALS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust organises two beer festivals each year and the surplus from these festivals are distributed as grants to organisations that benefit the communities of Haddenham, Bucks and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 13 July 2010: Standard registration
- 01 April 2022: Funds received from 295739 HADDENHAM AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan Ainslie Cumberland | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin James Daniels | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mary Guiraute-Goldsmith | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Towersey | Trustee | 21 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE JANE REED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN JOHN BROUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ROGER BARNES FINCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETE SUMMERSKILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.24k | £3.12k | £15.12k | £32.41k | £49.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.77k | £27.80k | £5.87k | £8.24k | £28.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
"TO FURTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES OF HADDENHAM IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS."
Area of benefit
HADDENHAM IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 LONG WALL
HADDENHAM
AYLESBURY
HP17 8DL
- Phone:
- 07818423117
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window