THE FARAWAY CHILDRENS CHARITY

Charity Number: 1137170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Initial Short term service provision objectives for the charity are to distribute diverse resources to needy children and young people and to develop a bank of sustainable gifts to distribute to children and young people at Christmas & Easter.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £30,059
Total expenditure: £31,801

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANE MARGARET DEAMER Chair 19 November 2012
None on record
Ann-Marie Prendiville Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record
Jessica Doherty Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Sarah Sherlock Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Jeanette Walsh Trustee 13 February 2017
None on record
Claudia Hardy Trustee 19 November 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.35k £25.56k £25.56k £18.25k £30.06k
Total expenditure £20.76k £15.66k £15.66k £20.27k £31.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Tyler Court
Shepshed
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 9SJ
Phone:
07495 539611