ASBESTOS VICTIM SUPPORT

Charity number: 1135588
Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH ASBESTOS RELATED DISEASES, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022

Total income: £782
Total expenditure: £1,442

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EOGHAN RONAN THOMAS CARTON OWEN Chair
None on record
PAUL SNOWDEN Trustee 22 January 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022
Total gross income £8.38k £684 £10.19k £687 £782
Total expenditure £1.15k £3.91k £4.68k £2.90k £1.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Mount Pleasant
Oxton
PRENTON
CH43 5SY
Phone:
0844 4140975