Trustees KATIE PIPER FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1133313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS HAROLD RUDGARD | Chair | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Caryn Jane Owen | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Rowena Mackie | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ciaran Patrick O'Boyle | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Sofield | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Martin | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|||||
DR TIM WOODMAN | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATIE PIPER | Trustee | 07 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.