BROCKHURST CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1134417
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £21.65k £22.00k £23.60k £23.88k £22.95k
Total expenditure £23.54k £18.02k £35.06k £22.90k £21.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A