THE TOUCHSTONE TRUST FOR EDUCATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Touchstone has three grant-making programmes: 1. International development: funding education and environmental projects with pastoralist communities in Tanzania. 2. Community Support: supporting charities who work with vulnerable individuals and families. 3.Art and Ideas: making grants to artists and researchers who are working on projects exploring contemporary beliefs, values and rituals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
- Tanzania
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Standard registration
- 09 March 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE TOUCHSTONE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE TOUCHSTONE TRUST FOR SOCIAL JUSTICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422.36k | £10.65k | £299.68k | £13.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.91k | £158.10k | £422.17k | £88.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 29 February 2016 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 06 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 06 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 19 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 15 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED 8 FEBRUARY 2010 NAME AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 29 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window