Accounts and annual returns KINGDOM OF GOD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL AND MOUNT CARMEL PRAYER ACADEMY

Charity number: 1137305
Charity reporting is overdue by 540 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 175 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 540 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 540 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 July 2022 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 July 2022 255 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 April 2022 541 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 April 2022 541 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 June 2020 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 June 2020 237 days late Download Open in new window