ACADEMIA EUROPAEA (THE ACADEMY OF EUROPE)

Charity number: 1133902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR Veljko Milutinovic Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR Genoveva Marti Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR OLE PETERSEN Trustee 25 September 2009 None on record
Professor Eva Kondorosi Trustee 01 January 2016 None on record
PROFESSOR Kirsten Drotner Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor Dr Seird Auke Pieter Leonard Cloetingh Trustee 29 September 2009 None on record
PROFESSOR Dagmar Coester-Waltjen Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR THEO D'HAEN Trustee 25 September 2009 None on record
Professor Svend Erik Larsen Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR Bjorn Wittrock Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR Alain Peyraube Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor Donald Dingwell Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record