THE PUMP (EAST BIRMINGHAM) LTD

Charity number: 1134459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £316.11k £254.58k £330.95k £420.32k £371.67k
Total expenditure £304.12k £240.03k £331.75k £371.59k £346.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £30.00k N/A N/A £50.00k