Accounts and annual returns GOD'S MIRACLE ARENA

Charity number: 1133584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 August 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 October 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required