Financial history GOD'S MIRACLE ARENA

Charity number: 1133584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £9.20k £9.45k £9.35k £0 £3.00k
Total expenditure £9.12k £9.20k £9.32k £0 £2.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A