GOOLE AND SELBY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134348
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 March 2017 On time Download