GOOLE AND SELBY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134348
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £305.30k £337.42k £321.89k £248.26k £258.39k
Total expenditure £281.08k £288.21k £322.58k £294.63k £317.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A