Accounts and annual returns 4 DADS, ITS A DADS THING

Charity number: 1135309
Charity reporting is overdue by 1250 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 519 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 519 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 884 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 884 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1250 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1250 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required