Financial history 4 DADS, ITS A DADS THING

Charity number: 1135309
Charity reporting is overdue by 1250 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £9.42k £7.28k £2.66k £739 £739
Total expenditure £2.32k £4.62k £1.92k £0 £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A