UNIVERSITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON STUDENTS’ UNION

Charity number: 1136470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 07 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 16 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download