Accounts and annual returns FOREST METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 November 2019 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 04 November 2019 127 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 November 2019 492 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 04 November 2019 492 days late Download Open in new window