Trustees ST MARY WITH ST PAUL TRUST AT PENZANCE CORNWALL

Charity number: 1133891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV LESLIE THOMAS ATTWOOD Chair 20 January 2017
HAYLE YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time
Frank Batt Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Tim Jones Trustee 05 December 2014
None on record
Valerie Cock Trustee 14 October 2013
None on record
Rev SIAN YATES Trustee 25 June 2013
FOUNDATION KNOWN AS DANIEL'S SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF MADRON
Received: On time
PENLEE CLUSTER OF CHURCHES
Received: 53 days late
THE SAINT PAUL'S TRUST OF PENZANCE
Received: On time